Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/25/2021 at 06:08:57 (UTC).

In the Estate of Harold D. Doss, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Harold D Doss, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********45-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Doss, Harold D.

Arlington, TX 76017

Applicant

Doss, Harold Dwight

Mansfield, TX 76063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Terry L Leedy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerMcGown, Quentin) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #25: Jody Michelle Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #24: Tate Roberson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #23: Tate Roberson for Greyson Roberson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #22: Angela Roberson for Duncan Roberson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #21: Zane Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #20: Zackary Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #19: Stefon Hanson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #18: Sharon Marie Scott for Sophie Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #17: Sharon Marie Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRequest Index #5: Copy of Order- Pd $2 NCC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113653: Doss, Harold Dwight: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Doss, Harold Dwight; Total Financial Assessment: 272.00; Total Payments and Credits: 272.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Paid $4 JF & $8 Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry L Leedy