This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/02/2018 at 23:42:16 (UTC).

In the Estate of Gloria Jean Weidman Whetstone, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 In the Estate of Gloria Jean Weidman Whetstone, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********44-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Thornton, Victoria Jean

Dallas, TX 75243

Decedent

Whetstone, Gloria Jean Weidman

Dallas, TX 75243

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Terry L Leedy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#9: Compliance Affidavit Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (9:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#7: and Waiver- Jan Hoskison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#6: letter for advanced payment of 3 cc of Will & Order & pd $2.00 jf for hearing on 4/9/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date: 03/26/2018; Public Notice: Served: 03/15/2018; Returned: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81644: Thornton, Victoria Jean: (38.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 38.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81601: Thornton, Victoria Jean: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Thornton, Victoria Jean; Total Financial Assessment: 294.00; Total Payments and Credits: 294.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry L Leedy