This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 22:03:13 (UTC).

In The Estate of Gerri Diane Dye, Deceased

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 In The Estate of Gerri Diane Dye, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********50-1

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Claimants

Truist Bank

800 Pencader Drive

Newark, DE 19702

c/o Simm Associates

Applicant and Executor

Riley, Patricia Ann Dye

Granbury, TX 76048

Decedent

Dye, Gerri Diane

Dallas, TX 75251

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant, Executor and Decedent Attorney

Rick J. Graham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 20: From Court RE: Show Cause Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialMail: Receipt # PR-0367454: Truist Bank: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Claimant Truist Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 19: Proof of Eservice of Notice Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Claim Index # 18: $8,092.90 - Eserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketClaim Index # 17: $8,092.90 - Acct. 1001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-127339: Dye, Gerri Diane: (1.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: January 11, 2021 @1:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-125440: DYE RILEY, PATRICIA ANN: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Riley, Patricia Ann Dye; Total Financial Assessment: 313.00; Total Payments and Credits: 313.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/06/2021; Public Notice: Served: 11/22/2021; Returned: 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 Jfs & Owes Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C/O Simm Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant