Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 06:07:11 (UTC).

In the Estate of George Joseph Pempsell, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of George Joseph Pempsell, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********61-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Pempsell, George Joseph Also Known As Pempsell, George J.

Godley, TX 76044

Not Classified By Court

Pempsell, Daniel

Godley, TX 76044

Pempsell, Daniel Also Known As Pempsell, Daniel Paul

Godley, TX 76044

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0361975: Pempsell, Daniel: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Distributee Pempsell, Daniel; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #2: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index #1: Attached with Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less