This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 18:48:11 (UTC).

In the Estate of George F. Smith, III, Deceased

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 In the Estate of George F Smith, III, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************-1-A

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant

LTP Finance, LLC

3045 Lackland Road

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Decedent

Smith, George F, III

Fort Worth, TX 76135

Administrator

Franscini, Stephen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Kelly E. DeBerry

Administrator Attorney

L. Stephen Franscini, V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Foreclose on Lien Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketExhibit List Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketApplication Hearing: (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer/Response Index # 5: Administrator's Original Answer to Application to Foreclose Lien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 4: 12/14/2021 3:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Ret Date 11/22/21; Public Notice: Served: 11/10/2021; Returned: 11/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PR-0365747: DeBerry, Kelly E.: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3: in Support of Application to Foreclose Lien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant LTP Finance, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketApplication to Foreclose on Lien Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less