Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:41:08 (UTC).

In the Estate of Gene Clark Trimble, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 In the Estate of Gene Clark Trimble, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly, Lynn and Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********96-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Kelly, Lynn

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Trimble, Gene Clark

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Tatum, Joann

Azle, TX 76020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorneys

Kenneth N. Price

Tyler A. Harden

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#14: 1 Order and Will to Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#13: Comp. Aff. waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (10:15 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Request Doc ID#11: Certified Copies- Pd $2 JFs, Pd $5 Certified Copies, Pd $6 Non-Certified Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Order for Substitution of Counsel Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Motion to Substitute Counsel Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Owes $4 JF and Owes for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0343426: Price; Kenneth; N.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-82792: Tatum, Joann: (13.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79600: TATUM, JOANN: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Tatum, Joann; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler A. Harden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth N. Price