This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/04/2022 at 07:17:10 (UTC).

In the Estate of Gayle Crouch, Deceased

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 In the Estate of Gayle Crouch, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********12-1

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicants

Simmons Bank Formerly Known As Southwest Bank Now Known As Southwest Bank

2200 W 7Th St.

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Simmons Bank

Decedent

Crouch, Gayle Also Known As Crouch, Frances Gayle

Arlington, TX 76005

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

John R. Garbo, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-135115: Simmons Bank: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 6: August 18, 2022 at 4:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-134693: MILLER, TOD M: (275.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Simmons Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 414.00; Total Payments and Credits: 414.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 412.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 07/11/2022; Public Notice: Served: 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF Pd $20 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southwest Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Simmons Bank is a litigant