Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/26/2018 at 23:39:59 (UTC).

In the Estate of Gary Paul Giromini, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Gary Paul Giromini, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********25-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Giromini, Gary Paul

Temple, TX 76502

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Bradley, Betty A.

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Dana Nicole Zachry

Dana N. Zachry

Applicant Attorney

Robert M. Brownrigg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • Order for Payment of Attorney Fees Doc ID#18: $400 to Dans N. Zachry from Registry/Appointment terminated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Sworn Statement of Fees and Expenses Doc ID#17: w/ Order Attached $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#16: Judgment Declaring Heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Judgment Determining Heirship Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Statement of Heirship Facts Doc ID#14: Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Statement of Heirship Facts Doc ID#13: Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Determination of Heirship Hearing: (3:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed: All waivers & Report of AAL filed/202 Atty cert filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Certificate Doc ID#12: 202.057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Report of Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Answer Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#4: Email Clerks Request of $400.00 Ad Litem Deposit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Citation - Publication: Ret. Date 01/01/2018; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 12/28/2017; Returned: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Determination of Heirship Doc ID#1: Owes $2.00 JFs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79669: Giromini, Gary Paul: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Financial Information: Decedent Giromini, Gary Paul; Total Financial Assessment: 385.00; Total Payments and Credits: 385.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0343063: Brownrigg, Robert M.: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Brownrigg, Robert M.; Total Financial Assessment: 4.00; Total Payments and Credits: 4.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Brownrigg