This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/04/2018 at 22:50:57 (UTC).

In the Estate of Forrest Dewey Tennant, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 In the Estate of Forrest Dewey Tennant, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********15-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Tennant, Sharon Louise

Bedford, TX 76022

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Tennant, Forrest Dewey

Bedford, TX 76022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Catherine A. Dunnavant

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Doc ID#12: Sharon Tennant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Waiver of 308 Doc ID#10: Sharon Tennant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#7: without bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 03/26/2018 RFC-23022731 03/08/2018 8:40PM; Public Notice: Served: 03/15/2018; Returned: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Owes $4.00 JFs, Owes for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81497: Tennant, Forrest Dewey: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial Information: Decedent Tennant, Forrest Dewey; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0343193: Dunnavant, Catherine A.: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-82150: Tennant, Sharon Louise: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Tennant, Sharon Louise; Total Financial Assessment: 8.00; Total Payments and Credits: 8.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine A. Dunnavant