This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/04/2020 at 08:45:25 (UTC).

In the Estate of Eugene Moore, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 In the Estate of Eugene Moore, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********37-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Moore, Eugene

Applicants and Executors

Moore, Terry Eugene Also Known As Moore, Terry

Joshua, TX 76058

Moore, Terry Eugene

Joshua, TX 76058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Jennifer L. Lovelace

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index #15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index #14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0357455: Moore, Terry Eugene: (16.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0356408: Lovelace, Jennifer L.: (28.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 28.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #6: 1/6/20 @ 3pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-98362: Moore, Terry Eugene: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Moore, Terry Eugene; Total Financial Assessment: 330.00; Total Payments and Credits: 330.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/23/2019; Public Notice: Served: 12/12/2019; Returned: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #3: and Waiver of Notice Terry Eugene Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin with Indep Exec 401.002a Index #1: Owes $4 Jfs Owes for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less