This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/05/2021 at 06:10:04 (UTC).

In the Estate of Ethel Oneida England, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Ethel Oneida England, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Ponder, Christopher W and McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********00-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Ponder, Christopher W

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Applicant

Garrett, Kevin

Krum, TX 76249

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

England, Ethel Oneida Also Known As England, Ethel O.

Bedford, TX 76022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Steven A. Early

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (10:15 AM) (Judicial OfficerMcGown, Quentin) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: May 24, 2021 at 10:45 a.m. via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113804: Garrett, Kevin: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Garrett, Kevin; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Pd $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven A. Early