This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/18/2023 at 11:02:13 (UTC).

In The Estate of Esteban Ortiz Gonzalez, Deceased

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 In The Estate of Esteban Ortiz Gonzalez, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Tarrant County Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48-1

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Claimants

Barclays Bank Delaware

1002 Justison Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

C/O Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.

Citibank, N. A..

1004 Justison Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

C/O Phillips & Cohen Associates

Administrator

Pantoja, Maria Guillermina Villa

1928 Willow Vale Dr

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Decedent

Gonzalez, Esteban Ortiz

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Marquez, Stephanie Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

Ali Anna Crocker

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Ola Horwath Campbell

Applicant Attorney

Jonathan W. Fox

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 34: Certified MERP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketReport of Attorney Ad Litem Index # 33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketAmended Appl for Indep Admin & To Determine Heirship Index # 32: Second

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index # 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAmended Appl for Determination of Heirship Index # 30: First

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 26: Clerk's E-mail to Attorney requesting Attorney Ad Litem Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 27: From Court Staff Re:Appl for Heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketMotion Index # 25: to Appoint AAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temp Administrator Index # 4: $20, 000 Bond

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOath Index # 3: NOT USED LB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketTemporary Administration: (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : Result: Order Signed: TADM & TRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-140707: Pantoja, Maria Guillermina Villa: (8.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-140640: Villa Pantoja, Maria Guillermina: (223.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Pantoja, Maria Guillermina Villa; Total Financial Assessment: 412.00; Total Payments and Credits: 412.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 360.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketApplication for Temp Admin Index # 1: with Supporting Affidavit Attached - Owes $4 JF & Ltrs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less