Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/28/2021 at 06:13:51 (UTC).

In the Estate of Elena Brisco, Deceased

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 In the Estate of Elena Brisco, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********05-2

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Oliver, Marian Also Known As Oliver, Marian Marie

Arlington, TX 76002

Decedent

Brisco, Elena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

John C. Arneson

Applicant Attorney

Isaac Shutt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketOrder for Payment of Attorney Fees Index # 12: $400.00 Registry & Discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Independent Administrator Index # 11: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketIndependent Admin with Determination of Heirship Hearing: (3:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Kelly, Lynn) : ishutt@shuttlawfirm.com msjkeys@ymail.com john@arnesonlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115578: Oliver, Marian: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate Index # 10: Certificate of Service Citation Isaac Shutt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114707: Brisco, Elena: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Brisco, Elena; Total Financial Assessment: 2.00; Total Payments and Credits: 2.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 9: 04/23/2021 at 3:15 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 4: 817-305-0607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-111368: Oliver, Marian: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Oliver, Marian; Total Financial Assessment: 389.00; Total Payments and Credits: 389.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: to Attorney Re Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 01/18/2021 added to OCa website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 01/20/2021; Returned: 01/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 01/18/2021; Public Notice: Served: 01/06/2021; Returned: 01/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters Pd $129 PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaac Shutt