Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/28/2021 at 06:40:26 (UTC).

In The Estate of Edna Ruth Sparks, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In The Estate of Edna Ruth Sparks, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********78-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Sparks, Edna Ruth

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Applicant and Executor

Tapley, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Michael Shane O'Dell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-118350: Tapley, James: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-118330: Tapley, James: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketRequest Index # 11: for Additional Letters Pd $4 Ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 9: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 7: Re Payment of Judge Fee Pd $4 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115013: Tapley, James: (264.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Tapley, James; Total Financial Assessment: 276.00; Total Payments and Credits: 276.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 264.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/12/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 5: Letter to the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less