Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/06/2021 at 04:32:36 (UTC).

In the Estate of Douglas M. Kincaid, Deceased

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 In the Estate of Douglas M Kincaid, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********27-2

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

McMordie, Mary Kincaid

Dallas, TX 75205

Decedent

Kincaid, Douglas M.

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Michael G. Appleman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAffidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index #16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index #15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #14: Filing Letter to Clerk RE: Attorney's Certificate 308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge: Received 9-30-2020 @ 9:39 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOath Index #12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index #9: Without Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #8: September 22, 2020 2PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #7: September 22, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-106949: MccMordie, Mary Kincaid: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant McMordie, Mary Kincaid; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 09/14/2020; Public Notice: Served: 09/03/2020; Returned: 09/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #3: Letter to the clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: PD $4 JF and $8 for Lttrs.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael G. Appleman