Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/03/2021 at 06:35:07 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dorothy Ruth Albright, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Dorothy Ruth Albright, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********70-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Wair, Arthelia

Crowley, TX 76036

Decedent

Albright, Dorothy Ruth

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Kaitlin Jo Philley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-118930: Wair, Arthelia: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-118894: Wair, Arthelia: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketRequest Index # 10: for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-118298: Wair, Arthelia: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: Hearing Setting Letter 06/16/2021 at 3:40 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 4: June 16, 2021 @ 3:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 4/12/21; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114999: Wair, Arthelia: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Wair, Arthelia; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF Owes for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaitlin Jo Philley