Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 05:35:45 (UTC).

In the Estate of Doris Ruth Carrington, Deceased

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 In the Estate of Doris Ruth Carrington, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********00-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Shaw, Carole Jean Also Known As Shaw, Carole Jean Carrington

Southlake, TX 76092

Decedent

Carrington, Doris Ruth

Keller, TX 76248

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (9:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-116213: Shaw, Carole Jean: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #8: 06/07/2021 at 9:45 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Redact Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115706: Shaw, Carole Jean: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Shaw, Carole Jean; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/26/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/15/2021; Returned: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMotion to Redact Index #3: Social Security Number

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #2: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR