This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 06:11:02 (UTC).

In the Estate of Doris Maude Victoria Jarvis, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Doris Maude Victoria Jarvis, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********02-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant

Harris, Romelee

Arlington, TX 76017

Decedent

Jarvis, Doris Maude Victoria

Arlington, TX 76018

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

David A. Coggin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email dcoggin@dcoggin.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #6: Re: Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113807: Harris, Romelee: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Harris, Romelee; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Death Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Coggin