Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/23/2018 at 22:47:42 (UTC).

In the Estate of Donald George Fleeman, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 In the Estate of Donald George Fleeman, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Decedent

Fleeman, Donald George

Applicant

Fleeman, Janice Rae

Arlington, TX 76010

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Reid A Rector

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#9: pd jf 2.00 & pd 3 page copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#8: Comp. Aff. waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (1:45 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#6: Re: To Original Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/20/2017; Returned: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Owes $2.00 JFs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341376: Rector; Reid; A: (5.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Rector, Reid A; Total Financial Assessment: 5.00; Total Payments and Credits: 5.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79595: Fleeman, Janice Rae: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Fleeman, Janice Rae; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid Rector