This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/11/2021 at 01:43:28 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dinisha K. Alvarado

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 In the Estate of Dinisha K Alvarado was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********17-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Sands, Valerie

Arlington, TX 76018

Decedent

Alvarado, Dinisha K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Kaitlin Jo Philley

Applicant Attorney

Shawna Young

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketOrder for Payment of Attorney Fees Index # 19: $400 Registry // Appt Terminated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Statement of Heirship Facts Index # 18: Kathy Walls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Statement of Heirship Facts Index # 17: Rita Callan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSworn Statement of Fees and Expenses Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketJudgment Determining Heirship Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDetermination of Heirship Hearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer McGown, Quentin) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 6: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 4: 469-336-5227

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115779: Sands, Valerie: (387.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Sands, Valerie; Total Financial Assessment: 389.00; Total Payments and Credits: 389.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 387.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 04/26/2021 Also Posted on OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/26/2021; Public Notice: Served: 04/15/2021; Returned: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 3: Clerk's E-mail to Attorney requesting Attorney Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Heirship Index # 1: Pd $2 JF, Pd $24 Poster, Pd $129 Pub

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawna Young