Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 06:14:37 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dennis W. Karl, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Dennis W Karl, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Decedent

Karl, Dennis W.

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Karl, Kevin

Euless, TX 76039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Robert C. Stroup

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: April 28, 2021 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113695: Karl, Kevin: (273.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Karl, Kevin; Total Financial Assessment: 273.00; Total Payments and Credits: 273.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 273.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Pd $4 JF Pd $5 NCC Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C. Stroup