Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 10/22/2018 at 07:33:37 (UTC).

In the Estate of DeLores Rishavy, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of DeLores Rishavy, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Brooke U and Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********26-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Brooke U

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Rishavy, Delores

Applicant and Executor

Gysbers, Cheryl

Maplewood, MN 55109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Grey Pierson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#17: Order Approving Inventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Order Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Doc ID#16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Inventory Appraisement and List of Claims Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Doc ID#14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#11: App't IEXR w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (2:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) : Result: Order Signed: 02/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0341934: Pierson, Grey: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Financial Information: Attorney Pierson, Grey; Total Financial Assessment: 2.00; Total Payments and Credits: 2.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-83848: Gysbers, Cheryl: (27.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Payment: Receipt # PR-0342243: Gysbers, Cheryl: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-80335: Gysbers, Cheryl: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79670: Gysbers, Cheryl: (266.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Gysbers, Cheryl; Total Financial Assessment: 305.00; Total Payments and Credits: 305.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grey Pierson