Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 06:07:28 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dee Allan Tucker, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 In the Estate of Dee Allan Tucker, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********13-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant

Tucker, Saundra Carole

Haltom City, TX 76117

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Tucker, Dee Allan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

David C. Bakutis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (11:15 AM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #8: 5/10/2021 11:15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketWaiver of 308 Index #7: Lyle Tucker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index #6: Brian David Tucker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAmended Appl for Probate of Will Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114806: Tucker, Saundra: (264.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Tucker, Saundra Carole; Total Financial Assessment: 264.00; Total Payments and Credits: 264.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 264.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/05/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/25/2021; Returned: 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Bakutis