Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/17/2021 at 01:03:27 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dean Lincoln Schreier, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 In the Estate of Dean Lincoln Schreier, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly, Lynn and Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********67-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Kelly, Lynn

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Schreier, Dean Lincoln

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Administrator

Schreier, Holly

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Thomas F. Dunn

Applicant and Administrator Attorney

Steven Katten

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index #28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index #27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer Index #25: Tina Schreier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0359374: Katten, Steven: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Facts Index #22: Deborah Schreier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Facts Index #23: Gregory Housewirth

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #6: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-101502: Schreier, Dean Lincoln: (397.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Schreier, Dean Lincoln; Total Financial Assessment: 409.00; Total Payments and Credits: 409.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 397.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 04-13-20; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 04/08/2020; Returned: 04/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #5: Email to Attorney RE: Request for Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04-13-20; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2020; Returned: 04/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #4: and Waiver of Bond, Power to Sell - Tina Schreier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #3: and Waiver of Bond, Power to Sell - Holly Schreier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index #1: PD $4 JF, PD $8 for Letters, PD $129 PUB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Katten