Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 09:28:27 (UTC).

In the Estate of David Ray Forgy, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 In the Estate of David Ray Forgy, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********45-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Forgy, David Ray

Applicant and Administrator

Forgy, Jesse

Belton, TX 76513

Interested Parties

Turnage, Sam Coe

Downing, Jacqueline Canada

Roberson, Ginger Ann King

Yakey, Mary Helen

Canada, John Curtis

Skeens, Kathleen Adele Kindall

Odom, Mary Helen

Bates, E Drue

Turnage, Josh

Canada, Ronnie J.

Garrison, Nancy Bates

King, Michael David

Mcrae, AR 72102

Baker, Amy Turnage

El Paso, AR 72045

Cardwell, Casey Lee

Hamilton, MT 59840

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

James B. Ravsten

Applicant and Administrator Attorney

G. Mack Zimmerman, II

Interested Party Attorneys

Brian David Hill

Brian Hill as Dependent Administrator with Will Annexed of the Estate of Troy Gene McCarty, Decease

Brian Hill

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #109

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder for Payment of Fees Index #108: Reimburse $15,655.24 // Compensation $9,737.63 // Estate Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder for Payment of Attorney Fees Index #107: $12,548.08 // Estate Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index #105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketApplication for Payment of Fees Index #104: Reimbursement and Compensation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketApplication for Payment of Fees Index #103: Attorney's Fees $15,561

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAmended Inventory Appraisement and List of Claims Index #102: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDecree Confirming Sale Index #100: 1756 Johnson Rd

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #6: and Waiver of Notice - Ronald Cardwell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #5: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-90300: Forgy, Jesse: (395.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Administrator Forgy, Jesse; Total Financial Assessment: 549.00; Total Payments and Credits: 549.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #4: Email Request of Ad Litem Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Ret. Date 03/25/2019; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 03/25/2019; Returned: 04/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Ret. Date 03/25/2019; Public Notice: Served: 03/13/2019; Returned: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Heirship Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin Intestate 401.003 Index #1: Owes $4.00 JFs, Pd $10.00 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less