This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 06:11:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of David L. Doyle, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of David L Doyle, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********07-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Ford, Phyllis Kay

Colleyville, TX 76034

Decedents

Doyle, David L.

Colleyville, TX 76034

Doyle, David L. Also Known As Doyle, David Lauren

Colleyville, TX 76034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Candace Sandifer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115447: Ford, Phyllis Kay: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #7: April 12, 2021 @ 10:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCodicil Index #6: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113825: Ford, Phyllis Kay: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Ford, Phyllis Kay; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCodicil - Copy Index #3: First Codicil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Candace Sandifer