Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/15/2019 at 18:14:24 (UTC).

In the Estate of David Keith Harris, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 In the Estate of David Keith Harris, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********10-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Harris, David Keith

Applicant and Executor

Burnham, Angela Also Known As Burnham, Angela R.

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Tena G. Fox

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Order Approving Account for Final Settlement Doc ID#41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Order for Payment of Fees Doc ID#40: Executor's Commission - $5,705.39 - Estate Pay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Order for Payment of Fees Doc ID#39: Reimbursement to Depend Executor - $9,338.49 - Estate Pay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Order for Payment of Attorney Fees Doc ID#37: $6,788.63 - Estate Pay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 04/08/2019; Public Notice: Served: 03/28/2019; Returned: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Application for Payment of Fees Doc ID#36: -Reimburse Dependent Executor-$9,338.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Application for Payment of Fees Doc ID#35: Attorney's Fees-$6, 788.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Application for Payment of Fees Doc ID#34: -Executor's Commission-$5,705.39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Account for Final Settlement Doc ID#33

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2: Holographic Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Application for Depend Admin Doc ID#1: Paid $4 JF, Paid $8 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-90697: Burnham, Angela: (76.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Transaction Assessment: 76.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-86220: Burnham, Angela: (24.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-83526: Burnham, Angela: (102.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 102.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79636: Burnham, Angela: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Burnham, Angela; Total Financial Assessment: 470.00; Total Payments and Credits: 470.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tena G. Fox