Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 06:16:58 (UTC).

In the Estate of Danielle LaShay Gardner, Deceased

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 In the Estate of Danielle LaShay Gardner, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********38-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Gardner, Danielle LaShay

Fort Worth, TX 76123

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Gardner, Reginald Ray

Fort Worth, TX 76123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Michael G. Appleman

Applicant Attorney

Michelle Simpson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #7: Letter to the Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #6: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index #4: 817-877-2803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113280: Gardner, Reginald Ray: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Gardner, Reginald Ray; Total Financial Assessment: 385.00; Total Payments and Credits: 385.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 3/8/21 - Posted to OCA Website; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/8/21; Public Notice: Served: 02/24/2021; Returned: 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #3: to Attorney Re Ad Litem Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Index #1: Owes $4 JF & Ltrs, Paid $129 Pub Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Simpson