This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/04/2020 at 08:29:48 (UTC).

In the Estate of Damon William Creamer, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 In the Estate of Damon William Creamer, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********41-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicants

Creamer, LaVonne S

Watauga, TX 76148

Creamer, LaVonne S.

Watauga, TX 76148

Decedents

Creamer, Damon William

Watauga, TX 76148

Creamer, Damon William Also Known As Creamer, Damon W.

Watauga, TX 76148

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Robert J. Rockett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-99683: Creamer, LaVonne S.: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Index #8: Comp. Aff. waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #6: Pmt $2 Jfs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: 1/27/20 @ 10:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-98372: Creamer, LaVonne S: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Creamer, LaVonne S.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Reurn Date 12/23/2019; Public Notice: Served: 12/11/2019; Returned: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less