Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/01/2021 at 06:58:13 (UTC).

In the Estate of Cynthia Elaine Bell, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 In the Estate of Cynthia Elaine Bell, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********44-2

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

Gilpin, Jesse Edward

Kansas City, MO 64110

Decedent

Bell, Cynthia Elaine

Hurst, TX 76053

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Yates, Jeffrey A.

Frisco, TX 75034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jeffrey A. Yates

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Thomas F. Dunn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #8: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Re Issue on OCA website Return Date 11/2/20; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index #6: 817-459-0000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-108462: Gilpin, Jesse Edward: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Gilpin, Jesse Edward; Total Financial Assessment: 385.00; Total Payments and Credits: 385.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 10/26/2020; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 10/16/2020; Returned: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 10/26/2020; Public Notice: Served: 10/13/2020; Returned: 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #5: Request for Attorney Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAppt of Resident Agent Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Heirship Index #2: Pd $129 Pub

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin Intestate 401.003 Index #1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas F. Dunn