Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/17/2018 at 08:53:40 (UTC).

In the Estate of Curtis Lee Ware, Deceased

Case Summary

On 08/29/2017 In the Estate of Curtis Lee Ware, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********77-2

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Claimants

C/O Estate Information Services, LLC

P. O. Box 1370

Reynoldsburg, OH 43068-6370

Discover Bank.

P. O. Box 1370

Reynoldsburg, OH 43068-6370

Applicant

Ware, Phyllis Ann

Arlington, TX 76016

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Ware, Curtis Lee

Arlington, TX 76016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Terry L Leedy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • Claim Doc ID#10: $4,219.97 - Notice Letter Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (9:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Under Advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Request Doc ID#8: Copies Request Pd $30 2 CC WIll & Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#7: and Waiver of Jennifer Ware Dvorak

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#6: and Waiver of Curtis Ware, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Ret date 09/11/2017; Public Notice: Served: 08/31/2017; Returned: 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: PD $2.00 JFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Mail: Receipt # PR-0341564: Discover Bank.: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Financial Information: Claimant Discover Bank.; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-77776: Ware, Phyllis Ann: (30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-77070: Ware, Phyllis Ann: (253.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Ware, Phyllis Ann; Total Financial Assessment: 283.00; Total Payments and Credits: 283.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C/O Estate Information Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry L Leedy