Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/11/2021 at 06:25:13 (UTC).

In the Estate of Corine Jimerson, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 In the Estate of Corine Jimerson, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is McGown, Quentin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********01-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

McGown, Quentin

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Crochett, Cynthia Also Known As Crochett, Cynthia Jimerson

Arlington, TX 76001

Decedent

Jimerson, Corine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Jennifer L. Lovelace

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAssoc. Judge Order Approved by Presiding Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Index # 7: Compliance Affidavit Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (10:45 AM) (Judicial Officer McGown, Quentin) : via zoom / comp aff waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-117092: Crochett, Cynthia: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDeclination to Serve Index # 6: and Waiver Christy Wafer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: May 25th, 2021 at 10:45am via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-115058: Crochett, Cynthia: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Crochett, Cynthia; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 4/12/21; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L. Lovelace