This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:39:35 (UTC).

In the Estate of Clyde LeFevre, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 In the Estate of Clyde LeFevre, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********96-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

LeFevre, Clyde Also Known As LeFevre, Clyde E.

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

LeFevre, Jeff Also Known As Lefevre, Jeffrey S.

Colleyville, TX 76034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Kate Smith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#10: of Will and Order - Pick Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Motion Doc ID#7: Judicial Notice of Foreign Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#6: Re: To Original Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 03/19/2018; Public Notice: Served: 03/08/2018; Returned: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Owes $2.00 JFs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0345376: Smith; Kate: (11.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 11.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81453: LeFevre, Jeff: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant LeFevre, Jeff; Total Financial Assessment: 267.00; Total Payments and Credits: 267.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less