This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/12/2018 at 22:44:07 (UTC).

In the Estate of Charlotte Lucille Murdock, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 In the Estate of Charlotte Lucille Murdock, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Murdock, Charlotte Lucille Also Known As Murdock, Charlotte L.

Applicant and Executor

Dunham, Linda Lee

Bedford, TX 76022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

William L. White

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Doc ID#14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#10: Independent Executor w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#7: Re: to Original Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 03/26/2018; Public Notice: Served: 03/14/2018; Returned: 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#5: Filing Letter to Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Pd $4.00 JFs, Pd $8.00 for Letters, Pd $2.00 Non-Certified Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81487: Dunham, Linda Lee: (270.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Dunham, Linda Lee; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer William L. White