This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 11/30/2021 at 20:53:06 (UTC).

In The Estate of Charles R. Lackey, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 In The Estate of Charles R Lackey, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********75-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Claimants

U. S. Bank National Association

800 Pencader Drive

Newark, DE 19702

c/o Simm Associates, Inc.

Applicant and Executor

Bobo, Johnny Lee

Azle, TX 76020

Decedent

Lackey, Charles R.

Azle, TX 76020

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Brooks P. Lynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate Index # 21: of Service for Inventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Claim Index # 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialMail: Receipt # PR-0362449: U. S. Bank National Association: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Claimant U. S. Bank National Association; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 17: Proof of Eservice of Notice Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 7: & Bond and Consent to Appointment - Charlotte Dady

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 6: & Bond and Consent to Appointment - Robert Lackey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: 2/22/2021 10:50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-110764: Bobo, Johnny Lee: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Bobo, Johnny Lee; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 12/28/2020; Public Notice: Served: 12/17/2020; Returned: 12/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin with Indep Exec 401.002a Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $ 8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C/O Simm Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brooks P. Lynn