This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 17:19:01 (UTC).

In the Estate of Charles R. Bingham, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 In the Estate of Charles R Bingham, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********34-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Webber, Tammara B.

Aledo, TX 76008

Decedent

Bingham, Charles R.

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Kelly E. DeBerry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketAffidavit in Lieu of Inventory Index # 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialPayment: Receipt # PR-0366720: DeBerry, Kelly E.: (25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCertified Copy Index # 12: Will and Order mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index # 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketAttorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Death and other Facts Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOath Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index # 6: w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 5: 12/13/2021 at 2:30 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-124299: Webber, Tammara B.: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Webber, Tammara B.; Total Financial Assessment: 293.00; Total Payments and Credits: 293.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 11/08/2021; Public Notice: Served: 10/26/2021; Returned: 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Pd $4 JF, Pd $8 Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly E. DeBerry