Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 06:33:45 (UTC).

In the Estate of Charles Doyne Henry, Deceased

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 In the Estate of Charles Doyne Henry, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

Henry, Charles Doyne

Applicants

Johnson, Brenda Kay Henry Also Known As Henry, Brenda Kay

Springtown, TX 76082

Cox, Katie Lynn Also Known As Cox, Kathie Lynn

Alto, TX 75925

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Kenneth N. Price

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Email thefirmprice@yahoo.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Muniment of Title Hearing; (10:10 AM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) ; Per Attorney; Email thefirmprice@yahoo.com; 03/15/2021; Reset by Court to 03/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-112603: JOHNSON, BRENDA KAY: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Johnson, Brenda Kay Henry; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 2/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 02/04/2021; Returned: 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth N. Price