Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/02/2019 at 06:52:48 (UTC).

In the Estate of Bobby Ronald Payne, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Bobby Ronald Payne, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is King, Steve M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********19-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

King, Steve M

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Payne, Richard Also Known As Payne, Richard Ray

Grapevine, TX 76051

Decedent

Payne, Bobby Ronald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorneys

MICHAEL W SWEET

MICHAEL W. SWEET

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Doc ID#16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Attorney's Certificate of Compliance 308.004 Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#13: Probate of Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#12: Ind. Exec. w/o bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (2:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerKing, Steve M.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#6: Re: To Original Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Pd $4.00 JFs, Pd $8.00 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79660: PAYNE, RICHARD: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Payne, Richard; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael W. Sweet