This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/31/2019 at 06:34:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Bobby Lee Isbell, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 In the Estate of Bobby Lee Isbell, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

Erskine, Rowena Marie

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Decedent

Isbell, Bobby Lee

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

JAMES A CREEL

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Darcy Niles Deno

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • Amended Appl for Indep Admin & To Determine Heirship Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Answer Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#8: 817-810-9962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Order Setting Aside Prior Order Doc ID#7: Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID#6: 817-744-8248***VACATED 4-4-18***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#5: Cover Letter Re: AAL Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#4: Email Request of Ad Litem Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Citation - Publication: Ret. Date 03/19/2018; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 03/13/2018; Returned: 03/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 03/19/2018; Public Notice: Served: 03/06/2018; Returned: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Application for Indep Admin 401.003 & Determine of Heirship Doc ID#1: Pd $4.00 JFs, Pd $8.00 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81358: ERSKINE, ROWENA MARIE: (397.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Erskine, Rowena Marie; Total Financial Assessment: 397.00; Total Payments and Credits: 397.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 397.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darcy Niles Deno