Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/14/2021 at 06:16:34 (UTC).

In the Estate of Bobby D. Finch, Deceased

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 In the Estate of Bobby D Finch, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********30-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Decedent

Finch, Bobby D. Also Known As Finch, Bobby

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Finch, Jean Ann Also Known As Finch, Jean Also Known As Finch, Jean A.

Burleson, TX 76028

Interested Party

Finch, Bobby G

Oklahoma City, OK 73127

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Leslie Starr Barrows

Applicant Attorney

Jennifer L. Lovelace

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Ponder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 11: July 19, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketReport of Attorney Ad Litem Index # 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 9: Request from Clerk for AAL Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer Attorney Ad Litem Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 6: 817-481-1583

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-112976: Finch, Jean Ann: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMotion Index # 5: to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-112448: Finch, Jean Ann: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Finch, Jean Ann; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCitation - Personal: Bobby G Finch; Finch, Bobby G: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-111443: Finch, Bobby D.: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Decedent Finch, Bobby D.; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 1/18/21; Public Notice: Served: 01/07/2021; Returned: 01/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index # 1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L. Lovelace