Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 05:17:56 (UTC).

In the Estate of Bobby Alonza Neely, Deceased

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 In the Estate of Bobby Alonza Neely, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28-2

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Applicant and Executor

Roach, Shirley Ann

White Settlement, TX 76108

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedents

Neely, Bobby Alonza

Neely, Bobby Alonza Also Known As Neely, Bob A.

Mansfield, TX 76063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

Reid A. Rector

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Inventory, Appraisment & List of Claims Index #16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketInventory Appraise Claims -no fee w/in 90 days qualification Index #15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice to Creditors Index #14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # PR-0358871: Rector, Reid A.: (24.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-105453: Roach, Shirley Ann: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOrder Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Index #12: w/o Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCodicil Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketWill - Original Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 06-22-20; Public Notice: Served: 06/09/2020; Returned: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-103499: Roach, Shirley Ann: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Roach, Shirley Ann; Total Financial Assessment: 284.00; Total Payments and Credits: 284.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCodicil - Copy Index #4: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCodicil - Copy Index #3: Second

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index #1: Owes $4 JF, Owes for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reid Rector