Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/08/2021 at 06:38:21 (UTC).

In the Estate of Bobbie Dee Golden, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Bobbie Dee Golden, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Golden, Bobbie Dee

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Golden, Rebeckah Jane

Springtown, TX 76082

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Dana N. Zachry

Applicant Attorney

Andrew F Stasio, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index # 7: Commercial Recorder Invoice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Index # 5: 817-263-5190

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-114993: Golden, Rebeckah Jane: (385.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Golden, Rebeckah Jane; Total Financial Assessment: 385.00; Total Payments and Credits: 385.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Publication: Return Date 04/12/2021 RFC 03/25/2021 2:12 p.m. #051816760; Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir: Served: 04/12/2021; Returned: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 04/12/2021 RFC 03/25/2021 2:12 p.m. #051816760; Public Notice: Served: 04/01/2021; Returned: 04/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCorrespondence Index # 4: to Attorney Re Ad Litem Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Determination of Heirship Index # 1: Owes $2 Jf, Pd $24 Poster, Pd $129 Pub

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR