Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/24/2020 at 00:58:20 (UTC).

In the Estate of Beverly P. Mitchell, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 In the Estate of Beverly P Mitchell, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly, Lynn and Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********04-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

Kelly, Lynn

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Claimants and Not Classified By Court

Citibank, N.A.AscensionPoint Recovery Services

200 Coon Rapids Boulevard, Ste. 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433

Porter, Dashan

Fort Worth, TX 76140

C/O AsensionPoint Recover Services

200 Coon Rapids Boulevard, Ste. 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433

Synchrony Bank

200 Coon Rapids Blvd., Ste. 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433

AscensionPoint Recovery Services

200 Coon Rapids Blvd., Ste. 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433

Citibank, N.A.

200 Coon Rapids Boulevard, Ste. 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433

Porter, Timothy

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Porter, Jimmy

Arlington, TX 76001

Mitchell, Airielle Schlynn

Fort Worth, TX 76110

Applicant and Administrator

Mitchell, William Earl

Fort Worth, TX 76110

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Porter, Dashan

Fort Worth, TX 76140

Decedent

Mitchell, Beverly P.

Interested Party and Claimant

Mitchell, Airielle Schlynn

Fort Worth, TX 76110

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant, Administrator, Claimant and Interested Party Attorneys

Kerry E. Moseley

W. T. Catterton

Not Classified By Court and Claimant Attorneys

Wendi Erinn Nichols Andino

William T. Catterton

W. T. Catterton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket306 Notice Index #82

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Claim Index #81: $2,916.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-99272: Mitchell, William Earl: (24.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 24.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 01/27/2020; Public Notice: Served: 01/15/2020; Returned: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSupplemental Index #80: to Sworn Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-98364: Mitchell, William Earl: (85.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation - Personal: Airielle Mitchell; Mitchell, Airielle Schlynn: Served: 12/31/2019; Returned: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-97994: Mitchell, William Earl: (27.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #7: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer/Response Index #6: Dashan Porter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketCorrespondence Index #5: Cover Letter Filing Notice of Apperance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Appearance by Attorney Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79620: Mitchell, William Earl: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Administrator Mitchell, William Earl; Total Financial Assessment: 639.00; Total Payments and Credits: 639.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Ret. Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/20/2017; Returned: 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketApplication for Depend Admin Index #1: Pd $4.00 JFs, Pd $8.00 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C/O AscensionPoint Recovery Services is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kerry E. Moseley