This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/14/2018 at 06:51:33 (UTC).

In the Estate of Betty A. Grim, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/02/2018 In the Estate of Betty A Grim, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********49-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Grim, George G.

Watauga, TX 76148

Decedent

Grim, Betty A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorneys

Kelly DeBerry

Kelly E. DeBerry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#11: Issued 1 App, Will & Order to Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#10: From Court Administrator To Attorney RE: Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#9: Compliance Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Proof of Subscribing Witness Doc ID#8: Robert A. Parmelee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (2:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn) : Result: Order Signed: Copy of Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#6: First Amended Application for Will not Produced in Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Waiver of Citation/Service Doc ID#5: Sandra Lange

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Waiver of Citation/Service Doc ID#4: Waiver of Citation - Cheryl Kay Jarchow Arment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Citation - Poster: Ret. Date 03/19/2018; Public Notice: Served: 03/07/2018; Returned: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: With Will-Copy Attached as Exhibit A - Pd $2.00 JFs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342842: DeBerry, Kelly: (17.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-81343: Grim, George G: (266.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Financial Information: Applicant Grim, George G.; Total Financial Assessment: 283.00; Total Payments and Credits: 283.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 266.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly E. DeBerry