Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/25/2021 at 06:08:03 (UTC).

In the Estate of Bette A McCue, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Bette A McCue, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Kelly, Lynn

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Decedent

McCUE, BETTE A

Arlington, TX 76016

Applicants

Abrolat, Karen Ann Heida

Ballwin, MO 63021

Abrolat, Karen Ann Heida Also Known As Heida, Karen Ann

Ballwin, MO 63021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Deborah K. Hartley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketProbate Of Will Hearing: (2:50 PM) (Judicial OfficerKelly, Lynn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #8: Waiver of Citation and Bond - Darren McCue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #7: Waiver of Citation and Bond - Becky McCue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #6: Waiver of Citation and Bond - Susan Vierling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index #5: Waiver of Citation and Bond - Diane Denny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113658: Abrolat, Karen Ann Heida: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Abrolat, Karen Ann Heida; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indep Admin with Will Annex 401.002b Index #1: PD $4 JF PD $8 ltrs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah K. Hartley