This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 11/14/2021 at 06:05:19 (UTC).

In the Estate of Berton Tompkins, Deceased

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 In the Estate of Berton Tompkins, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********08-2

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicants

Reap, Lori Ann Also Known As Maxwell, Lori Ann Reap

Haslet, TX 76052

Tompkins, Jeremy J.

Texarkana, TX 75501

Decedent

Tompkins, Berton

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Rick Weaver

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 8: Tuesday, December 28, 2021 @ 2:10 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Citation/Service Index # 7: Waiver of Citation and Consent to Appointment Shaun Tompkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 6: and Waiver - Judith Ann Tompkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketConsent to Appointment Index # 5: and Waiver - Jeremy Tompkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index # 4: Hearing Setting Letter 12/28/2021 at 2:10 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-124221: Maxwell, Lori Ann Reap: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Reap, Lori Ann; Total Financial Assessment: 256.00; Total Payments and Credits: 256.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 11/01/21; Public Notice: Served: 10/21/2021; Returned: 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketApplication for Probate of Will Index # 1: Owes $4 JF and Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rick Weaver