Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 06:19:01 (UTC).

In the Estate of Barbara Estell Lloyd, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 In the Estate of Barbara Estell Lloyd, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Ponder, Christopher W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********49-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Ponder, Christopher W

 

Party Details

Decedent

Lloyd, Barbara Estell

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicants

Lloyd, Harold, JR

Bruce, Beverly

Lloyd, Harold Edgar, JR

Fort Worth, TX 76114

Bruce, Beverly Ann Also Known As Bruce, Beverly Ann Baxter

Fort Worth, TX 76114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Bradford L. Shaw

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMuniment of Title Hearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerPonder, Christopher W.) : via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketHearing Setting Letter Index #5: April 29, 2021 @ 1:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketWill - Original Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 3/15/21; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113660: Bruce, Beverly: (270.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Bruce, Beverly Ann; Total Financial Assessment: 270.00; Total Payments and Credits: 270.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketWill - Copy Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication for Muniment of Title Index #1: Paid $2 JF, $7 Non CC's, & $5 CC's

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford L. Shaw