Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/09/2018 at 18:04:13 (UTC).

In the Estate of Barbara Annis Reese Snider, Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 In the Estate of Barbara Annis Reese Snider, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********21-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant and Executor

Petta, Glen O.

Fort Worth, TX 76109

Decedent

Snider, Barbara Annis Reese

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Executor Attorney

GREGORY G TURNER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2018
  • Notice to Creditors Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Certificate of Compliance Doc ID#11: 308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • 306 Notice Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory Doc ID#12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate & Granting Letters Testamentary Doc ID#9: Ind. Exec. w/o bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Probate Of Will Hearing: (2:00 PM) () : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • Correspondence Doc ID#6: COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Correspondence Doc ID#5: Re: To Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Will - Original Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3: With attached Probate Supplemental Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/21/2017; Returned: 12/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Application for Probate of Will Doc ID#1: Pd $4 JF and $8 for Letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342007: Petta, Glen O.: (12.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79662: Petta, Glen O.: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Petta, Glen O.; Total Financial Assessment: 280.00; Total Payments and Credits: 280.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory G Turner