This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 06:08:09 (UTC).

In the Estate of Barbara Ann Starks, Deceased

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 In the Estate of Barbara Ann Starks, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********70-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Decedent

Starks, Barbara Ann

Haltom City, TX 76117

Not Classified By Court

Starks, Anthony

Haltom City, TX 76117

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Todd Duncan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket306 Notice Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy Index #6: 1 CC of SE Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Small Estate Affidavit Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCitation - Poster: Return Date 03/15/2021; Public Notice: Served: 03/04/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-113830: Starks, Anthony: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Distributee Starks, Anthony; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Index #4: Death Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProbate Supplemental Case Information Sheet Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketSmall Estate Affidavit Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TODD DUNCAN