Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/05/2018 at 03:42:29 (UTC).

In the Estate of Andrew Young Kilcrease, Jr., Deceased

Case Summary

On 12/14/2017 In the Estate of Andrew Young Kilcrease, Jr , Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Brooke U. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********70-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Brooke U

 

Party Details

Decedent

Kilcrease, Andrew Young, JR Also Known As Kilcrease, Andrew Young

Not Classified By Court

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Applicant

Kilcrease, Andrew Young, III

Arlington, TX 76001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

Bruce L. Mansfield

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2018
  • Certified Copy Doc ID#14: Issued 2 Will & Order to Attorney Pd JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Oath Doc ID#13: of No Debts Against Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Order Admit Will to Probate as Muniment of Title Doc ID#12: Comp. Aff. waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Proof of Death and other Facts Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Muniment of Title Hearing: (2:15 PM) (Judicial OfficerAllen, Brooke U.) : Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Will - Original Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Notice Doc ID#9: Hearing March 5, 2018 @ 2:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#8: Vonice Kilcrease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Declination to Serve Doc ID#7: Julie Kilcrease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Waiver of 308 Doc ID#6: Vonice Kilcrease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Waiver of 308 Doc ID#5: Julie Kilcrease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Waiver of 308 Doc ID#4: Andrew Kilcrease, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Citation - Poster: Return Date 01/01/2018; Public Notice: Served: 12/19/2017; Returned: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Will - Copy Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Application for Muniment of Title Doc ID#1: Owes $2 JF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # PR-0342301: Mansfield, Bruce L.: (30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-79536: KILCREASE, ANDREW: (256.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Financial Information: Applicant Kilcrease, Andrew Young, III; Total Financial Assessment: 286.00; Total Payments and Credits: 286.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 256.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce L. Mansfield